ORTHODOX FELLOWSHIP OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes unity amongst Orthodox Christians and provides study and fellowship opportunities through provision of residential and day conferences. The publication of: an occasional journal Forerunner; an Orthodox liturgical calendar with daily scripture readings and commemorations; and a directory of Orthodox clergy and parishes in the UK and Ireland. The conduct of pilgrimage and youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony M Lizotte | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Nikitin | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jessica Stenstrom | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sirafim | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Christopher Carter | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abera Anastaziia Veluppillai | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Kyriacos Georgiou | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Ann Theokritoff | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev IOAN NAZARCU | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MAMAKOS | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARCHIMANDRITE KYRIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £12.40k | £7.57k | £24.21k | £16.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.88k | £10.07k | £7.55k | £23.29k | £19.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 1997 as amended on 14 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Felstead Road
WALTHAM CROSS
Hertfordshire
EN8 7HB
- Phone:
- 07837548146
- Email:
- OFSJBEvents@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window