Financial history BIDEFORD YOUTH PIPE BAND

Charity number: 1098029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.11k £1.22k £5.17k £8.14k £6.43k
Total expenditure £1.24k £3.31k £4.80k £5.06k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A