FALCON ROWING AND CANOE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training & education Sports related
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 May 1997: Standard registration
- 18 January 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1186921 FALCON BOAT CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.07k | £1.06k | £2.70k | £104.00k | £159.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £27.36k | £3.55k | £2.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 27 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 27 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
09 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH MAY 1997
Charitable objects
A. THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION EITHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE (IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROMOTION OF ROWING AND PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE SCHOOLS OF EAST OXFORD SHALL BE AN ESPECIAL OBJECTIVE) B. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ORGANISAION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM TO TAKE PART IN ROWING OR SCULLING OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDSSS
Area of benefit
SCHOOL OF EAST OXFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window