THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF MATHEMATICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of research, dissemination of research findings and promotion of history in mathematics education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 March 1997: Standard registration
- BSHM (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick James Burchell | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN SCOTT MANN | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Deborah Anne Kent | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher David Hollings | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Murray Gardiner | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ciaran Mac an Bhaird | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brigitte Stenhouse | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Margaret Leddy | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.56k | £17.08k | £15.67k | £18.63k | £16.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.82k | £8.66k | £10.07k | £12.22k | £11.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 1997 as amended on 08 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HISTORY OF MATHEMATICS BY RESEARCH AND AND DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH, DEVELOP PUBLIC AWARENESS AND PROMOTE THE USE OF THE HISTORY: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Andrew Thurburn & Co
38 Tamworth Road
CROYDON
CR0 1XU
- Phone:
- 07706161653
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window