THE WILTSHIRE WILDLIFE CONSERVATION VOLUNTEERS

Charity number: 1063811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Practical conservation management by volunteers on Wiltshire Nature reserves. We work on wildlife sites managed by the Wiltshire Wildlife Trust, the Woodland Trust, Natural England, the National Trust and private individuals. Sites may be meadow, downland, woodland or wetland. Activities are open to all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024

Total income: £2,150
Total expenditure: £2,208

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WWCV (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr RICHARD PHILIP GARNETT AISBITT Chair
None on record
Anthony Luscombe Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
RODERICK CLIVE POYNTING Trustee 14 September 2013
THE RADNOR HALL
Received: On time
DR SUSAN FITZPATRICK Trustee
None on record
MR G PARSONS Trustee
None on record
MRS B STIDDARD Trustee
None on record
LAURIE LOVELACE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £2.15k £1.63k £1.48k £2.15k £2.15k
Total expenditure £1.55k £2.03k £2.03k £2.21k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2023 11 June 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2022 03 April 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
84 GODDARD AVENUE
SWINDON
SN1 4HT
Phone:
01793694680