Financial history THE WOOLWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303664
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £55.55k £30.32k £22.30k £77.62k £0
Total expenditure £53.25k £32.05k £16.71k £73.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A