Trustees GREATER LONDON SOUTH COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 303883
Up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Ellen Lawford Smith | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Sturgess | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Terrance Stewart-Tomkins | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Rosemary Gabriella Littlejohns-Hennessy | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alfie FRancis | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Doverty | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jason Hagan | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Ensom | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lodge | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cheryl Stonebridge | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Bain | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||
RUSSELL JONES | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MR DAVE ATTENBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.