BRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds and supports research, education, publications and other activities in the built environment for public benefit. Awards post graduate research scholarships and supports university chairs. Commissions, facilitate and supports carbon emission reduction projects and such other activities and services as are beneficial to the built environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£59,925,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £57.40m | |
Other trading activities | £1.87m | |
Investments | £662.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£55,705,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £55.71m | |
Other | £0 |
-£461,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,345,000 from 62 government contract(s) and £340,000 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £55.71m | |
Retained for future use | £4.22m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 34 |
£70k to £80k | 25 |
£80k to £90k | 10 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 5 |
£110k to £120k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 4 |
£200k to £250k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 May 2002: Standard registration
- FOUNDATION FOR THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Wilbraham | Chair | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Chandler | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PETER BURRETT REID | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Bream | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mills | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ashley Mark Hook | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Denise Pope | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Graeme Rickard | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.90m | £52.29m | £59.64m | £59.78m | £59.93m | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.55m | £49.70m | £50.79m | £54.92m | £55.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.99m | £5.79m | £6.08m | £6.98m | £4.35m | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.28m | £8.13m | £7.96m | £3.32m | £340.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.00k | £2.78m | £1.90m | £1.72m | £1.87m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £52.89m | £49.51m | £57.73m | £57.91m | £57.40m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £4.00k | £10.00k | £153.00k | £662.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £50.55m | £49.70m | £50.79m | £54.92m | £55.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.27m | £22.47m | £22.49m | £29.21m | £27.50m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.00k | £5.00k | £6.40m | £0 | £8.52m | |
|
Other assets | £19.42m | £22.60m | £30.15m | £30.63m | £28.71m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£32.81m | -£41.77m | -£31.59m | -£29.96m | -£34.02m | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.31m | £18.07m | £20.89m | £19.89m | £21.85m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY VARIOUS SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 15 MAR 2002 (EFFECTIVE FROM 1 APR 2002), 4 DEC 2007 AND 3 NOV 2010. as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
2. Objects 2.1 The objects of the Charity are: 2.1.1 to undertake, commission and support research in areas of science, engineering, information technology, management and economics associated with the built environment, including its processes and artefacts, 2.1.2 to advance knowledge, innovation, and communication, and to promote education and excellence, in all such matters, and to collect, collate and publish useful information ideas, and data relating thereto, and 2.1.3 to undertake, commission, facilitate and support such other activities and services as are beneficial to the built environment and charitable in law in accordance with the law of England and Wales provided that it will not include any purpose which is not charitable in accordance with s.7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005. For the avoidance of doubt, the system of law governing the constitution of the Charity is the law of England and Wales.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bucknalls Lane
WATFORD
Hertfordshire
WD25 9NH
- Phone:
- 01923 665168
- Email:
- sarah.realmuto@bregroup.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window