OLD CATTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing the village hall and its facilities for use by various organisations within the village. Those include Parish Council, Playgroup, W.I., Old Catton Society, Horticultural Society, Rainbows, Brownies, Guides , Yoga and fitness group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Tanner | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gwynn | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anderson | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GAIL HOWES | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Leggett | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRADLEY WILLIAM SABBERTON-COE | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA THREADGOLD | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.29k | £28.33k | £21.60k | £13.31k | £13.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.85k | £9.37k | £21.25k | £21.06k | £32.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 2ND JULY 1984
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
OLD CATTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 CHURCH STREET
OLD CATTON
NORWICH
NR6 7DR
- Phone:
- 01603412651
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window