Financial history TASBURGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity Number: 304085
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.50k £29.40k £54.03k £38.55k £28.89k
Total expenditure £39.28k £28.56k £39.17k £43.66k £27.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.94k £22.37k £2.92k £848