Trustees TASBURGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity Number: 304085
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Pates Chair 14 June 2023
None on record
Sally Katherine Bull Trustee 12 August 2024
None on record
Karen Delia Hazell Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Martin Carey Bull Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Michael Robert Daniels Mr Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Mick Ireson Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Lloyd Stanley Giacomelli Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Shaun Palmer Trustee 11 July 2017
None on record
David Moore Trustee 11 July 2017
None on record