Financial history WOODBASTWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.36k £17.51k £2.66k £2.80k £4.47k
Total expenditure £10.95k £4.93k £4.75k £2.15k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.57k N/A N/A N/A