Trustees THE DUDLEY WINTERBOTTOM MEMORIAL HALL, HACKLETON
Charity Number: 304200

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY SHAW | Chair | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE CATLIN | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KELLY LOUISE HUTTON | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN DIVEY | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF DIVEY | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Anderson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
ALAN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HUNT | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SHAW | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARMAINE WALKER | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ADAMS | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ADAMS | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOAN BAYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAM HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.