Financial history TEMPLECOMBE RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 304464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.78k £12.03k £12.58k £12.30k £12.47k
Total expenditure £23.64k £8.87k £15.85k £18.41k £11.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A