Trustees TEMPLECOMBE RECREATION GROUND
Charity Number: 304464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Michael Cave | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Neil Molineux | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Kathleen Vaughan | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Dorothy McAree | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Jack Savage | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Bassett | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Arthur Hood | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
TINA JANE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
ALLAN RAYMOND KERRY | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS SARAH WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.