BICKNOLLER VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a village hall for use by the community, together with a children's play area and playing field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Revd William Nigel Stock | Chair | 27 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Gary Robert Sears | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
martin kitchen | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Claire Rawle | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sarah Harrison | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Michele Higgs | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Angela Fawcett | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Pumphrey | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michele Celeste Sears | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.98k | £27.15k | £33.82k | £38.91k | £20.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.96k | £13.50k | £59.80k | £27.25k | £32.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.84k | £13.00k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JUNE 1948, TRUST DEED DATED 18TH OCTOBER 1949, DEED OF CONFIRMATION DATED 19TH OCTOBER 1949 AND DEED OF GIFT DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1971 as amended on 26 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BICKNOLLER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bicknoller Village Hall
Honey Row Lane
Bicknoller
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA4 4EQ
- Phone:
- 07729533922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window