VILLAGE HALL BREDFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining a Village Hall, which provides space and facilities for local groups and individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE HENDERSON | Chair | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Deniza Taylor | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Cannard | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NORMAN | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Palmer Seargeant | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Woods | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Randall Dean | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HOWARD COOK | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Harker | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY TRAFFORD BENCE | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN HEPPER | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.27k | £33.66k | £30.46k | £26.42k | £34.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.24k | £21.71k | £15.05k | £19.92k | £35.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.52k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 5TH APRIL 1949
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PUBLIC PLAYING FIELDS AND OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREAION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENT OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BREDFIELD AFORESAID AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
BREDFIELD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Three Gables
The Street
Bredfield
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 6AX
- Phone:
- 01394 388440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window