Financial history BUCKLESHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.82k £38.07k £52.56k £15.86k £22.61k
Total expenditure £16.53k £32.59k £55.89k £13.32k £20.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.69k N/A £4.51k £1.00k N/A