Financial history GRUNDISBURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304754
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £4.80k £15.31k £11.59k £19.77k £12.10k
Total expenditure £6.73k £8.64k £12.18k £5.32k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.00k £10.10k