PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Grundisburgh Playing Fields for the benefit of all residents of Grundisburgh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 September 1962: Standard registration
- 03 December 2021: Funds received from 282472 THE MID SUFFOLK HOLIDAY OPPORTUNITY PLAYSCHEME FOR...
- GRUNDISBURGH PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN LAXTON | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||
John Nicholas Ellerby | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||
David Edward John Keates | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Adrian McAllister | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Caryer | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON GARROD | Trustee | 05 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CROWE | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|||||
ANN WILLETTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.44k | £14.24k | £24.92k | £13.41k | £8.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £5.09k | £2.75k | £23.86k | £5.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.63k | £6.24k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28 APRIL 1939 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED UNDER S 74D 15 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELD ANDRECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GRUNDISBURGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ceanchor House
Otley Road
Grundisburgh
Woodbridge
IP13 6RZ
- Phone:
- 01473738174
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window