RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A sports field for the physical training, recreation and social development for the inhabitants of the parish of Stoke by Nayland and its immediate vicinity - including football, tennis, play areas for children, adult exercise equipment and a basketball practice area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY BLOOMFIELD | Chair | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gerard Marshall | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Moore | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Stansfield | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Copeland | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Emeny | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|||||
FRANCES LUNN | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16k | £14.26k | £12.37k | £1.66k | £2.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.50k | £2.54k | £2.82k | £16.13k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.22k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15 NOV 1950 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STOKE-BY-NAYLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Vicarage
Church Street
Stoke By Nayland
CO6 4QL
- Phone:
- 07917569052
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window