FRIMLEY AND CAMBERLEY CADET CORPS AND MAPLE LEAF CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The corps is a private, totally independent voluntary organisation maintained by private subscription and fund raising, started over 115 years ago. It gives and develops moral, mental and physical training to boys and girls 6.5-18 years old to develop character, moral strength, good manners, self respect and self control via a military style organisation and structure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 April 1964: Standard registration
- FRIMLEY AND CAMBERLEY CADET CORPS AND MABLE LEAF CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL FERRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sunjeev Punn | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Perry | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Errol Hutchings | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Fraser | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVEY | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.47k | £21.64k | £24.85k | £22.80k | £20.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.93k | £20.17k | £23.20k | £21.45k | £19.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD MARCH 1964
Charitable objects
BOYS' CLUB.
Area of benefit
FRIMLEY AND CAMBERLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Ffordd Dol Y Coed
Bryncae
Llanharan
PONTYCLUN
Mid Glamorgan
CF72 9WA
- Phone:
- 07836726236
- Email:
- NIGELFERRIS21@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window