LALEHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305063
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing a weekly meeting place for numerous community activities such as dancing, pilates, yoga, children's groups for music,etc,, Darby & Joan Club for the elderly. In addition there are random weekly events for adult and children,s parties and Village events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £21,600
Total expenditure: £22,589

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Calvert Trustee 24 February 2016
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Richard Stokes Trustee 20 January 2015
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
KEITH VIGURS Trustee 01 November 2014
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Mavis Duncan Trustee 30 August 2014
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
COLIN STUART SQUIRE Trustee
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
HALLIFORD SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
SPELTHORNE YOUNG VOICES
Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
ROTARY CLUB OF TWICKENHAM TRUST FUND
Received: 8 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 31/12/2022
Total gross income £25.70k £27.90k £8.57k £21.77k £21.60k
Total expenditure £28.46k £26.14k £14.30k £21.60k £22.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 May 2022 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 March 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 12 March 2021 73 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Perrys Cottage
Blacksmiths Lane
Staines-upon-Thames
TW18 1UB
Phone:
07720853376
Website:

No information available