RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a recreational and play area for use by village residents and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE DICKSON PATRICK | Chair |
|
||||||
Raymond Alfred Sieber | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Malcolm Higgins | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Wreford | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise Dickinson | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Wicks | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eric Ian Hamilton Palmer | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CHARLES MURPHY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TWO DEEDS OF GIFT BOTH DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1948
Charitable objects
FOR THE PERPETUAL USE BY THE PUBLIC FOR AN OPEN SPACE FOR EXERCISE AND RECREATION
Area of benefit
WEST CLANDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amberleaf
Clandon Road
West Clandon
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU4 7TL
- Phone:
- 07597 156153
- Email:
- clerk@westclandon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window