Trustees 5TH REIGATE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loraine Mountain | Chair | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Isard | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Redman | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter James Wolsey | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dawn Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Potter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Mountain | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ian Pinto | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Mountain | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER SALVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.