THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOUTH-WEST ENGLAND

Charity number: 305951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Girlguiding South West England provides a range of activities and opportunities for girls and young women aged from 5 years to adult in Berkshire, Hampshire, Wiltshire, Bristol, Gloucestershire, Somerset, Dorset, Devon, Cornwall, Isle of Wight, Jersey and Guernsey.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Gloucestershire
  • Hampshire
  • Isle Of Wight
  • Isles Of Scilly
  • Somerset
  • West Berkshire
  • Wiltshire
  • Guernsey
  • Jersey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING SOUTH WEST ENGLAND (Working name)
  • SOUTH WEST ENGLAND GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • SOUTH WEST ENGLAND GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • SOUTH WEST ENGLAND REGION GIRL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Johnson Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Bryony Franco Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Simone Porter Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Colette Merrien Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Beverley Osborne Trustee 01 May 2024
BUCKHORN WESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOMERSET
Received: On time
SOMERSPIRIT
Received: On time
Racheal Tattum Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Susan Harris Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rosie Gitsham Trustee 07 April 2023
None on record
Jane Yorke Trustee 12 April 2022
BERKSHIRE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Karen McFarlane Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Janet Parker Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
Solange Rebours Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.11m £834.93k £655.50k £811.22k £944.25k
Total expenditure £1.04m £671.81k £569.78k £723.01k £991.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.78k £5.74k £54.81k £72.79k £146.22k
Income - Other trading activities £78.42k £48.76k £63.95k £50.67k £74.73k
Income - Charitable activities £993.24k £773.06k £531.23k £678.80k £700.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.64k £7.37k £5.51k £8.95k £23.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £54.81k £54.81k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £985.87k £635.92k £526.90k £677.40k £949.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.51k £35.89k £42.88k £45.61k £42.44k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £294.61k £299.72k £286.67k £286.81k £271.29k
Long-term investments £1.20m £1.07m £1.49m £1.18m £1.31m
Other assets £502.74k £724.91k £356.97k £743.81k £753.08k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £357.19k £216.11k £40.10k £131.68k £224.21k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Guides Association
St. Anns Manor
6-8 St. Ann Street
Salisbury
SP1 2DN
Phone:
01722329306