THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of trustee services and advice to branches of the Guide Association and Scout Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Wilson | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Tracy Foster | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Rona Elizabeth Rommel | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dymond | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/10/1937 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED BY ROYAL CHARTER WITH CHARITY REGISTRATION NUMBER 306016) AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO UNDERTAKE, ACCEPT, EXECUTE, PERFORM AND ADMINISTER ANY TRUSTS OR CONDITIONS AFFECTING LANDS, BUILDINGS, HEREDITAMENTS, INVESTMENTS, FUNDS OR OTHER PROPERTY WHATSOEVER HELD OR OWNDED IN TRUST OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FOR ANY OF THE PURPOSES OR OBJECTS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION OR ANY BRANCH THEROF OR COMPANY OR LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES ESTABLISHED ACCORDING TO THE REGULATIONS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION AND RECOGNISED THEREBY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17-19 Buckingham Palace Road
LONDON
SW1W 0PT
- Phone:
- 02078346242
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window