Financial history DUMPTON SCHOOL

Charity Number: 306222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.68m £3.67m £3.87m £4.17m £4.46m
Total expenditure £3.74m £3.76m £3.74m £4.16m £4.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £160.56k £56.26k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £161.06k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £3.67m £0 £7.86k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.50m £4.70k £3.85m £4.15m £4.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.03k £1.32k £1.22k £6.14k £26.96k
Income - Other £13.40k £0 £11.59k £0 £4.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.74m £3.76m £3.74m £4.16m £4.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.03k £55.13k £19.80k £32.14k £32.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0