WILLIAM MACKRELL (THE ELDER AND YOUNGER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and cultural thinking for the benefit of the community of the Parish of Sturminster Marshall and surrounding environs, in such ways as are exclusively charitable as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 29 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE MACKRELL CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Lorette Williams | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE GRAHAM KERSHAW | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Johnson | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Barry James Johnson | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elisabeth Holden | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ELIZABETH NORMAN | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.65k | £3.89k | £7.92k | £15.14k | £12.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.68k | £6.25k | £7.31k | £10.90k | £8.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 JUNE 1888 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION (CONCURRED WITH BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS UNDER S.74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 10/1/02)
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF STURMINSTER MARSHALL IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STURMINSTER MARSHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School
172 Church Street
Sturminster Marshall
Wimborne
Dorset
BH21 4BU
- Phone:
- 0774095113
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window