TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (KNOWN AS TAVISTOCK COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Grants to pupils of Tavistock College
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 12 September 1962: Standard registration
- TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Johnson | Chair |
|
||||||
James Buchanan | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ruth Ellis | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Bridgewater | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Marie Neill | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica May Evans | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY CHARLES ORTON | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Welsh | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH KATHERINE ANNE SELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.94k | £14.18k | £14.47k | £15.07k | £15.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.82k | £9.93k | £3.87k | £10.88k | £29.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1932, 4TH OCTOBER 1951, 2ND SEPTEMBER 1966, 18TH AUGUST 1967 AND 10 DECEMBER 1984 AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 21 MARCH 2006 AND RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 18 JANUARY 2007 AND 9 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED TAVISTOCK SCHOOL, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE RURAL DISTRICT OF TAVISTOCK AND WHO ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 15 OF THE SCHEME OF 2ND SEPTEMBER 1966)
Area of benefit
THE RURAL DISTRICT OF TAVISTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Priory Close
Whitchurch
Tavistock
PL19 9DJ
- Phone:
- 01822612743
- Email:
- johnolver2132@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window