Financial history THE MOUNT CAMPHILL COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 307027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.35m £2.27m £2.44m £2.92m £3.57m
Total expenditure £1.91m £1.87m £2.08m £2.49m £2.84m
Income from government contracts £2.20m £2.07m £1.98m £2.60m £3.45m
Income from government grants £17.18k £17.18k £54.21k £38.77k £20.93k
Income - Donations and legacies £117.48k £176.73k £242.75k £244.05k £92.62k
Income - Other trading activities £27.92k £0 £23.45k £52.30k £75.27k
Income - Charitable activities £2.20m £2.07m £2.17m £2.60m £3.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.14k £2.24k £989 £17.92k £41.25k
Income - Other £0 £17.96k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.86m £2.08m £2.47m £2.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.28k £10.26k £1.62k £18.29k £7.11k
Expenditure - Governance £17.40k £19.11k £25.12k £16.62k £19.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0