Financial history WESTBOURNE HOUSE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.39m £5.14m £6.07m £7.15m £6.89m
Total expenditure £5.25m £5.15m £5.58m £6.64m £6.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £388.64k £155.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £268.49k £0 £11.91k £53.44k £25.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.77k £0 £89.52k £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.72m £4.97m £5.94m £6.84m £6.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.04k £15.96k £33.75k £80.60k £152.38k
Income - Other £388.64k £155.41k £80.35k £85.88k £126.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.25m £5.14m £5.57m £6.58m £6.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.40k £7.96k £9.86k £52.77k £11.41k
Expenditure - Governance £17.71k £0 £19.15k £20.64k £21.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £18.12k £0 £0 £685 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.40k £0 £9.86k £10.00k £11.41k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0