WARD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education, including social and physical training of boys and girls in the area of Northwood and Cowes (The Ancient Parish of Northwood) on the Isle of Wight.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 30 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JAMES LAMBERT | Chair |
|
||||||
Pamela Janice Clements | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW BLIZZARD BA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £3.08k | £2.66k | £3.32k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £288 | £739 | £5.16k | £2.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH OCTOBER 1938
Charitable objects
(A) ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. (B) MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OF SCHOOL CHILDREN. (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF POORER BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF NORTHWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Woodvale Close
COWES
PO31 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01983292145
- Email:
- mandwp@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window