THE NORMAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Education including social and physical training of beneficiaries and awarding prizes and supporting educational facilities in Edenbridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Read | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Sumner | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Stephen Iles Lloyd | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Baker | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Francis Richard Aldridge | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Victor Howard Jennings | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Damodaran | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Zoe Roberts Smith | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Todd | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Alan Sydney Layland | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
Margot McArthur | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
STUART MCGREGOR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR J SCHOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £894 | £907 | £872 | £423 | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £2.22k | £0 | £0 | £2.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 2 MARCH 1920. SCHEME OF 14 NOVEMBER 1957, AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND A RESOLUTION PASSED 12 MAR 2007 UNDER S74(2)(C).
Charitable objects
1. AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION, APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEE. 2. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS CLOTHING TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. 3. OTHERWISE PROMOTING EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES, PROVIDED THAT 5 PER CENT OF NET ANNUAL INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED IN AWARDING "NORMAN PRIZES" OR FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSE TO ANY EDUCATIONAL FACILITY IN EDENBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EDENBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
72a High Street
Edenbridge
TN8 5AR
- Phone:
- 01732865368
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window