Financial history JOHN SPICER'S APPRENTICING CHARITY

Charity Number: 307742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.52k £2.54k £2.57k £2.60k £2.61k
Total expenditure £3.60k £3.68k £1.85k £940 £2.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A