THE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society organises events throughout the year to promote greater knowledge of the works of Gilbert and Sullivan to members and the public in general. We provide an up to date Gilbert and Sullivan library at the Barbican in London and publish the Gilbert and Sullivan news three times a year. The society also makes occasional grants to similar organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 1997: Standard registration
- 26 April 2024: Funds received from 1164859 EFFERVESCENT SOCIAL ALCHEMY
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PENN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LEON PETER FRANCIS BERGER | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Zena Patricia Jean Wigram | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Robert Mountsteven | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Kelly Barnes | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GRAY | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MAY PENN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CELIA LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Tritton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.12k | £118.25k | £11.99k | £10.83k | £34.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.10k | £8.03k | £17.65k | £16.77k | £24.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 21ST JULY 1999 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF GILBERT AND SULLIVAN'S WORKS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, CONCERTS THE MAINTENANCE OF A GILBERT AND SULLIVAN LIBRARY AND MUSEUM AND THE PRODUCTION OF A REGULAR GILBERT AND SULLIVAN PUBLICATION FOR MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barataria
42
Avenue Road
Erith
Kent
- Phone:
- 01322838298
- Email:
- sangaz@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window