THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS POST GRADUATE CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Centre are the advancement of medical and dental education, to all doctors, dentists and those in professions allied to medicine. To include the provision of comfortable accommodation for all junior doctors in training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 25 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Garth Sommerville | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Yates | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.19k | £16.35k | £55.73k | £29.24k | £24.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.63k | £20.53k | £40.80k | £31.91k | £49.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD MARCH 1970
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF GRADUATES IN MEDICINE DENTISTRY AND RELATED ARTS AND SCIENCES FOR THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL DENTAL AND VETERINARY RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TUNBRIDGE WELLS POSTGRADUATE CENTRE
EDUCATION & TRAINING CENTRE LEVEL 2
TUNBRIDGE WELLS HOSPITAL
TONBRIDGE ROAD
PEMBURY
KENT
- Phone:
- 01892635368
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window