ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the work of the Anglican Communion worldwide by providing funds for educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Kent
- Oxfordshire
- Burundi
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- India
- Israel
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH SAINT AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE VENERABLE WILLIAM JONATHAN ADAM | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Peniel Jesudason Rufus Rajkumar | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
DAVID JOHN WHITE | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Jennifer Strawbridge | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Right Rev Anderson Jeremiah | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Revd. Canon Dr Timothy James Neville Naish | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.15k | £301.61k | £349.72k | £232.18k | £318.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £222.25k | £225.80k | £360.13k | £279.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 28/06/1848, SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 12/06/1947 AND 10/04/1979, SCHEME DATED 29/09/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28/01/1980
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A COLLEGE TO PROVIDE AN EDUCATION TO QUALIFY YOUNG MEN FOR THE SERVICE OF THE CHURCH IN THE DISTANT DEPENDENCIES OF OUR EMPIRE.
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY
Linked charities
- ADELAIDE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- ALICE REDPATH
- BISHOP STRACHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- BRIGHTON SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- BRYMER BELCHER TRUST
- CHARLES PEARSON SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- CLARKE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- CLERGY ORPHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- COLERIDGE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- COLLEGE ASSOCIATION INVESTMENT
- ELIZABETH MANSERGH EXHIBITION FUND
- ELKIN MEMORIAL FUND
- FANNY J SIMMONDS FUND
- FESSEY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- GILBERT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- GOODMAN
- HAWKINS PRIZE FUND
- HAWKINS SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- HUTCHESSON
- JOSEPH BOWKER EXHIBITION FUND
- KAY PRIZE
- LEICESTERSHIRE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- LITT ELLIS SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- LOUISA FRANCES RAMSAY EXHIBITION FUND
- MARTYN PRIZE FUND
- MARY ANN COOK SMALL
- MEDICAL EDUCATION FUND
- MISS M A C SMALL
- NEW SCHOLARSHIP
- NORTHBOURNE TRUST FUND
- ORIENTAL PRIZE FUND
- PEDDER PRIZE FUND
- PHILLIMORE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- REVEREND CARTWRIGHT
- RICHARD TAYLOR EXHIBITION FUND
- ROBERT PATTERSON EXHIBITION FUND
- ROBERTS
- ROBERTSON BEQUEST
- ROFFE SCHOLARSHIP
- SHEPPARD EXHIBITION FUND
- SOUTHWARK
- STUDENTS MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- WHYTEHEAD GREEK TESTAMENT PRIZE FUND
- WILFRED SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- WILLIAM WALLACE SCHOLARSHIP
- 15 May 1991 : Standard registration
- 01 September 2022 : Removed
- 01 September 2022 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Gilbertson Road
HERTFORD
SG13 7BE
- Phone:
- 07989 389530
- Email:
- staugustinef@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window