Accounts and annual returns WITNEY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity Number: 308032
Charity reporting is overdue by 1805 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 344 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 344 days
Annual return 07 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 710 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 710 days
Annual return 07 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1075 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1075 days
Annual return 07 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1440 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1440 days
Annual return 07 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1805 days
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1805 days