Financial history THE RAYLEIGH DIVISION GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 308248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £300 £0 £125 £4.20k £848
Total expenditure £647 £99 £675 £4.39k £575
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A