GUIDE ASSOCIATION BUCKINGHAMSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GIRLGUIDING ENABLES GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AND TAKE AN ACTIVE AND RESPONSIBLE ROLE IN SOCIETY, THROUGH A STIMULATING AND ENJOYABLE PROGRAMME OF ACTIVITIES DELIVERED BY TRAINED VOLUNTEER LEADERS. OUR VISION IS TO BE RECOGNISED AS THE LEADING ORGANISATION FOR GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 15 October 1973: Standard registration
- 16 February 2021: Funds received from 1040858 KEN DENHAM TRUST
- GIRLGUIDING BUCKINGHAMSHIRE (Working name)
- BUCKINGHAMSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET SMITH | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Loach | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Gillian Carol MacKenzie | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Berryman | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karyn Evans | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Berry | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hissey | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni MacDonald | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
LISA DAWN FORD | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Judith Freeman | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
RUTH BOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £762.83k | £141.03k | £193.70k | £591.52k | £183.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £706.30k | £92.85k | £176.15k | £143.52k | £127.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.27k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £124.31k | N/A | N/A | £447.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £204 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £635.62k | N/A | N/A | £126.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.71k | N/A | N/A | £8.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £8.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £442.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £706.30k | N/A | N/A | £142.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £4.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £989 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2025 | 728 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2025 | 728 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Walton Terrace
Walton Street
AYLESBURY
HP21 7QY
- Phone:
- 01296 487683
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window