THE ORATORY SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for boys and girls in any part of the world. general physical, moral and religious education in accordance with Roman Catholic doctrines and practices and for that purpose to carry on and maintain The Oratory Schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£10,977,493
Donations and legacies | £40.39k | |
Charitable activities | £10.10m | |
Other trading activities | £555.47k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £281.81k |
Total expenditure:
£10,709,712
Raising funds | £268.17k | |
Charitable activities | £10.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £268.17k | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.44m | |
Retained for future use | £267.78k |
People

151 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 12 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 February 1972: Standard registration
- THE ORATORY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Collicutt | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ronksley | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Rawlings | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dent | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter McDonald | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Shields | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Wyndham Wilder | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Hobley | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francis Patrick Gargent | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fr Daniel Seward | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RICHARD BARNARD HOBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
KATHERINE MARY CARBERRY-LONG | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.88m | £7.68m | £8.24m | £10.91m | £10.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.05m | £7.05m | £8.13m | £9.58m | £10.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £112.30k | £63.27k | £22.38k | £62.00k | £40.39k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £278.03k | £327.84k | £246.39k | £439.56k | £555.47k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.50m | £5.82m | £7.65m | £8.81m | £10.10m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.99m | £1.47m | £320.92k | £1.60m | £281.81k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.83m | £6.89m | £7.99m | £9.34m | £10.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £220.32k | £158.36k | £145.07k | £236.94k | £268.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.76k | £31.92k | £32.35k | £46.25k | £32.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.03m | £12.56m | £12.49m | £12.41m | £12.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.67m | £1.61m | £1.59m | £1.56m | £2.15m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£130.00k | -£82.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.91m | £4.72m | £4.55m | £3.11m | £3.09m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/09/1931 AND MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/01/1950 AND 01/01/1964 AND 11/06/1980 AND 16/06/1982 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATE 18/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GENERAL, PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR BOYS AND/OR GIRLS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO CARRY ON AND MAINTAIN THE ORATORY SCHOOL WHEREVER THE SAME MAY BE CARRIED ON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ORATORY SCHOOL
WOODCOTE
READING
RG8 0PJ
- Phone:
- 01491683600
- Email:
- bursary@oratory.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window