Financial history CHARLBURY EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.79k £13.39k £13.74k £25.89k £17.02k
Total expenditure £18.54k £16.11k £11.12k £18.66k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A