EWELME ELEMENTARY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Repairs to Ewelme School Buildings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,208
Total expenditure: £3,208

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Wyn Marshall Trustee 30 April 2024
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
Dr Daniel Timothy Richardson Wilson Trustee 30 January 2024
HENLEY CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
Michael John Tait Trustee 30 January 2024
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
IMOGEN BIRCH REYNARDSON Trustee 28 April 2020
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
WATLINGTON HOSPITAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 22 days late
Rev PATRICK GILDAY Trustee 01 January 2018
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
Philip Walter Chamberlain Trustee
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time
THE CENTRAL REGION FARMERS TRUST
Received: On time
PATRICK GOSSET Trustee
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.40k £10.15k £17.29k £1.33k £3.21k
Total expenditure £46.40k £10.15k £17.29k £1.33k £3.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 St Giles'
OXFORD
OX1 3LE
Phone:
07518 297138