THE BRIGSTOCK SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of local children inside and outside the education system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 November 1963: Standard registration
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 December 2013: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Cantley | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne Mullins | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Sadler | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY WILKS | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Hone | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lowe | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Searle | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £9.96k | £10.07k | £15.31k | £8.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.99k | £1.98k | £2.00k | £20.61k | £10.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18TH NOVEMBER 1924
Charitable objects
INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR - MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE SCHOOL PREMISES; ASSISTING PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL FOR EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY; MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL AND IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF POORER BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRIGSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Latham Street
Brigstock
Kettering
Northamptonshire
NN14 3HD
- Phone:
- 01536373282
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window