KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supervises three schools which are independent day schools for pupils who are educated up to the age of university entrance. The Schools seek to provide academic education of high quality, extended by a broad range of cultural and sporting opportunities and supported by a responsive pastoral system and firm moral framework.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£43,476,000
Donations and legacies | £600.00k | |
Charitable activities | £38.05m | |
Other trading activities | £4.60m | |
Investments | £232.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£37,948,000
Raising funds | £1.95m | |
Charitable activities | £36.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.95m | |
Charitable expenditure | £36.00m | |
Retained for future use | £5.53m |
People

443 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 43 |
£70k to £80k | 17 |
£80k to £90k | 13 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 2 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Paul Clive Deighton KBE | Chair | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sreena Gawley | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Larizadeh BA | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Toni Oki BA | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Stockil BA MBA | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Andre Prager BA | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Ng BSc FCA | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Grace Sarpong | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Christopher Hale MA LLM | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
JULIE LINDA ROBINSON BA M.Ed | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Robert Parker MA | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|||||
MR Ian Macmillan | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Duncan George Ingram | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Sally Hobbs BA PGCE | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Strafford BA MBA | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.29m | £35.72m | £37.74m | £42.77m | £43.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.60m | £31.78m | £33.31m | £35.46m | £37.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £577.00k | £110.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.17m | £1.10m | £1.08m | £2.65m | £600.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.89m | £1.98m | £2.97m | £3.97m | £4.60m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £32.16m | £32.00m | £33.68m | £36.12m | £38.05m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £68.00k | £56.00k | £20.00k | £28.00k | £232.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £577.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00k | £202.00k | £158.00k | £2.03m | £21.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £29.19m | £30.23m | £32.01m | £33.83m | £36.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.41m | £1.56m | £1.30m | £1.63m | £1.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £62.00k | £70.00k | £69.00k | £87.00k | £76.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £75.29m | £74.34m | £72.41m | £72.05m | £69.98m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.71m | £10.47m | £15.82m | £18.48m | £26.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£3.47m | -£4.39m | -£4.28m | -£1.04m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £16.47m | £16.36m | £15.35m | £9.88m | £10.10m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
KINGS COLLEGE LONDON (TRANSFER) ACT 1908 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 26/06/1909 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11/10/1912 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13/10/1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/10/1954 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13/03/1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/06/1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/12/2014 AS AMENDED ON 21 MARCH 2018 as amended on 13 Dec 2018 as amended on 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE CARRYING ON OF THE SCHOOL OF THE CORPORATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- BARRY PRIZE
- BERNARD WOOD-HILL MEMORIAL PRIZES
- CALLAN PRIZE
- CARGILL PRIZE
- COLMAN MUSIC PRIZE
- DONALD RUSSELL PRIZE FOR ENGLISH VERSE
- EDGELL HUNT'S SCHOLARSHIPS
- EDWARDES JONES MATHEMATICAL PRIZE
- FOREST FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP
- FULFORD ENGLISH LITERATURE PRIZE
- INGLIS FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP
- JOHN CUTLER SCHOLARSHIPS
- JOHN TWENTYMAN PRIZES
- K C S LODGE PRIZE
- K C S MUSIC PRIZE
- KERSLAKE MATHEMATICAL PRIZES
- KINGS COLLEGE SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- L J MORISON PRIZES
- LEOPOLD DE ROTHSCHILD FRENCH SCHOLARSHIP
- MACLEAR PRIZES
- NEGUS PRIZE
- NORTHCOTT TRAVEL SCHOLARSHIP
- ROSSETTI PRIZE
- RUST MEMORIAL PRIZES
- SAMBROOKE FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP
- THE JELF MEDAL
- THOMAS WILTON PRIZE
- TOM KERR MEMORIAL PRIZE
- WARD SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- WILLIAM MORRIS EXHIBITION
- 26 March 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL
SOUTHSIDE COMMON
LONDON
SW19 4TT
- Phone:
- 020 8255 5300
- Email:
- bursar@kcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window