Financial history THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL

Charity number: 310033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £60.41m £67.90m £74.16m £84.01m £87.76m
Total expenditure £54.75m £60.27m £69.06m £75.96m £85.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.70m £739.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.34m £10.15m £9.12m £10.02m £7.93m
Income - Other trading activities £5.32m £6.21m £8.27m £10.02m £11.31m
Income - Charitable activities £43.93m £48.17m £54.25m £60.72m £65.41m
Income - Endowments £885.00k £721.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.92m £2.35m £2.40m £3.25m £3.11m
Income - Other £1.90m £1.01m £120.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £50.00k £11.00k £1.56m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £49.50m £54.53m £60.06m £66.32m £74.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.02m £1.52m £2.06m £2.04m £2.06m
Expenditure - Governance £77.00k £88.00k £93.00k £98.00k £83.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £23.00k £403.00k £687.00k £493.00k £649.00k
Expenditure - Other £4.23m £4.22m £6.95m £7.60m £8.19m