RICHARD JONES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational grants are given to students at school, college and university to assist with course books and equipment who are resident in the villages of Chew Magna, Stanton Drew, Stanton Prior, Stowey Sutton and Newton St Loe. Small donations are given to those who are both elderly and in need at Christmas time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 19 June 1978: Standard registration
- RICHARD JONES FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN KENYON KNIBBS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Tibbs | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Bragg | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joyce Robertson | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MAURICE HASELL | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|||||
SALLY SLINGO | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN ROY ELVIN | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JON SHERMAN WHEATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LESLIE SEWART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE WENDY HARDWICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.48k | £4.34k | £4.46k | £4.63k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.20k | £4.20k | £4.88k | £3.50k | £7.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 30 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CIVIL PARISHES OF CHEW MAGNA, NEWTON ST. LOE, STANTON DREW, STOWEY SUTTON AND ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH ST. LAWRENCE STANTON PRIOR WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24D Tyning Road
Saltford
BRISTOL
BS31 3HL
- Phone:
- 01225341085
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window