THE INSTITUTE OF HISTORIC BUILDING CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IHBC exists to promote, for the benefit of the public, the conservation of and education and training in the conservation of buildings, structures, areas, gardens and landscapes which are of architectural or historic value in the UK insofar as it lies within the duties and responsibilities of any person whose principal professional skills are to provide specialist advice in conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 March 1997: Standard registration
- IHBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Serena Cardozo | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Moore | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Parsons | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shantanu Subramaniam | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Khan | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Saady | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Cairns | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Grant | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John McDonald | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lone-Beatrix Le Vay | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID WILLIAM SHEPHERD | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Jo Evans | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jill Kerry | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Stones | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.02k | £407.37k | £374.75k | £398.16k | £428.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.51k | £351.72k | £289.75k | £309.30k | £374.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 24 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 03 Dec 2020 as amended on 18 Feb 2021 as amended on 26 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS 2.1 The Institute's objects are restricted specifically, in each case only for the public benefit to the: (a) Conservation and enhancement of the historic environment; (b) promotion of the highest standards of specialist skills in built and historic environment Conservation including in the understanding, care, and enhancement of the built and historic environment; accreditation and regulation of built and historic environment Conservation professionals; and (c) education and training of such professionals alongside any parties or interests that can help secure observance of the Objects of the Institute as set out in articles 2.1(a) to 2.1(b) inclusive above.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee House
High Street
Tisbury
SP3 6HA
- Phone:
- 01747873133
- Email:
- secretary@ihbc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window