THE FRIENDS OF ALNE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support & enhancement of childrens education & environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 November 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ALNE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Siobhan Catherine Cliff | Chair | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Bell | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wilsdon | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
lydia Taylor | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dowson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Emma Rogers | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Bradshaw | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Morris | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Samantha Davies | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Blackburn | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Alexander | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marie Copeland | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £8.49k | £3.17k | £2.03k | £12.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.51k | £9.96k | £1.49k | £3.33k | £11.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OUTWOOD PRIMARY ACADEMY ALNE
MAIN STREET
ALNE
YORK
YO61 1RT
- Phone:
- 01347838427
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window